WI AB279 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 16.004 (21), 16.004 (22), 20.855 (4) (cr), 20.855 (4) (cy), 20.855 (4) (dr), 66.0615 (1m) (f) 4., 77.983, 77.992, 232.07 (1), 345.28 (4) (g) and 846.17; to renumber 229.47; to renumber and amend 59.40 (4) and 232.07 (2); to amend 24.605, 24.61 (2) (cm) (intro.), 24.62 (3), 24.67 (1) (intro.), 24.67 (3), 59.52 (28), 66.0603 (1g) (a), 66.1105 (2) (f) 1. (intro.), 66.1105 (2) (f) 2. (intro.), 70.11 (37), 71.93 (8) (b) 1., 74.07, 77.22 (1), 79.035 (5), 229.26 (4), 229.26 (4m), 229.26 (10), 229.41 (12), 229.42 (4) (intro.), 229.42 (4) (d), 229.42 (4) (e), 229.42 (4) (f), 229.435, 229.44 (4) (intro.), 229.44 (4) (a), 229.44 (4) (b), 229.44 (4) (c), 229.44 (4) (d), 229.44 (5), 229.44 (6), 229.477, 229.48 (1) (intro.), 229.48 (1) (a), 229.48 (1) (b), 229.48 (1) (c), 229.48 (1) (d), 229.48 (1) (e), 229.48 (1m), 229.48 (2), 229.50 (1) (a) (intro.), 229.50 (1) (d), 229.50 (1) (f), 229.50 (7), 232.05 (3) (a), 232.05 (3) (b), 345.28 (2) (c), 345.37 (intro.), 846.10 (2), 846.101 (2), 846.102 (1), 846.103 (1), 846.103 (2) and 893.93 (2) (b); to repeal and recreate 20.835 (6) (g), 24.61 (2) (a), 71.93 (8) (c) and 846.16; and to create 16.004 (21), 16.004 (22), 16.58 (3), 20.835 (6), 20.855 (4) (cr), 20.855 (4) (cy), 20.855 (4) (dr), 24.60 (2m) (e), 24.61 (3) (a) 14., 24.66 (3y), 24.67 (1) (q), 24.718, 59.40 (4) (b), 59.67, 66.1105 (2) (f) 1. p., 66.1105 (9) (a) 10., 66.1105 (17) (d), 71.05 (1) (c) 6p., 71.26 (1m) (n), 71.93 (8) (c), 77.54 (62), 79.035 (6), 229.40, 229.41 (9e), 229.41 (11e), 229.41 (11g), 229.42 (4) (g), 229.42 (4) (h), 229.42 (4e), 229.42 (7) (b) 1m., 229.44 (4) (f), 229.461, 229.47 (2), 229.48 (7), 229.54, 232.05 (2) (h), 342.41, 345.28 (2) (d), 349.13 (1d), 349.132, 891.385 and 893.93 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: constructing a sports and entertainment arena and related facilities and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Constructing a sports and entertainment arena and related facilities and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-07-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-07-23 | House | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and placed on calendar 7-28-2015 pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2015-07-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-07-23 | House | Report of joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions received |
2015-07-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-07-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-07-15 | House | Executive action taken by joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions |
2015-07-06 | House | Public hearing held by joint committee on Finance |
2015-07-06 | House | Emergency statement attached by Governor pursuant to s. 16.47(2), Wisconsin Statutes |
2015-07-06 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions |
2015-07-06 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2015-07-06 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab279 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB279.pdf |