WI AB27 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Published 4-2-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 196.209; to amend 30.025 (4) (c), 196.07 (1), 196.191 (3) (a) 2., 196.203 (4m) (a), 196.31 (1) (intro.), 196.49 (5g) (ar) 1m. d., 196.491 (2) (f), 196.491 (3) (a) 1., 196.491 (3) (a) 2m. a., 196.499 (1) (b), 196.499 (1) (f) and 196.85 (3); to repeal and recreate 196.31 (2m); and to create 196.026 (7m), 196.20 (9) and 196.315 of the statutes; Relating to: making various changes to statutes administered by the Public Service Commission and requiring investor-owned energy utilities to fund a consumer advocate. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making various changes to statutes administered by the Public Service Commission and requiring investor-owned energy utilities to fund a consumer advocate. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HousePublished 4-2-2021
2021-04-01HouseReport approved by the Governor on 4-1-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 24
2021-03-25HousePresented to the Governor on 3-25-2021 by directive of the Speaker
2021-03-25HouseReport correctly enrolled on 3-25-2021
2021-03-23HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2021-03-23SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-03-23SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2021-03-23SenateRules suspended
2021-03-23SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-03-23SenateRead a second time
2021-03-23SenateSenator Carpenter added as a cosponsor
2021-03-19SenatePlaced on calendar 3-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-03-19SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2021-03-19SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-03-19SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2021-03-17SenateReceived from Assembly
2021-03-17HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-03-17HouseRead a third time and passed
2021-03-17HouseRules suspended
2021-03-17HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-03-17HouseAssembly Amendment 2 adopted
2021-03-17HouseRead a second time
2021-03-11HousePlaced on calendar 3-17-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-03-11HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2021-03-11HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 14, Noes 0
2021-03-11HouseReport Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 14, Noes 0
2021-03-03HouseExecutive action taken
2021-03-03HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Petersen
2021-03-02HouseLRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1)
2021-03-02HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petersen
2021-02-24HousePublic hearing held
2021-02-15HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-02-04HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-01-29HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities
2021-01-29HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab27
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2021/REG/AB27.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/enrolledbills/2021/REG/AB27.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/acts/2021/24.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/AB27-AA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/AB27-AA2.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/fe/ab27/ab27_psc.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/records/assembly/energy_and_utilities/1601383.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/fe/ab27/ab27_dnr.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcamendmentmemos/2021/REG/AB27.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcactmemos/2021/REG/Act%2024.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback