WI AB27 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-13 - Published 12-14-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-13 - Published 12-14-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 14.11 (2) (b), 16.705 (1) and 108.14 (3m); and to create 20.9305 of the statutes; Relating to: state agencies entering into contracts for legal services on a contingent fee basis. (FE)
Title
State agencies entering into contracts for legal services on a contingent fee basis. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Concurred in (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Refused to refer to committee on Judiciary and Labor (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Refused to refer to committee on Judiciary and Labor (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-13 | House | Published 12-14-2013 |
2013-12-13 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 12-13-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 105 |
2013-12-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 12-12-2013 |
2013-10-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 10-18-2013 |
2013-10-08 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Concurred in, Ayes 23, Noes 10 |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Refused to refer to committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 15, Noes 18 |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 laid on table |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 laid on table |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 18, Noes 15 |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 18, Noes 15 |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 offered by Senators Vinehout, Harris, Lehman, T. Cullen, C. Larson, Lassa, Hansen, Carpenter, Risser and L. Taylor |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senators Vinehout, Harris, Lehman, T. Cullen, C. Larson, Lassa, Hansen, Carpenter, Risser and L. Taylor |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Vinehout, Harris, Lehman, T. Cullen, C. Larson, Lassa, Hansen, Carpenter, Risser and L. Taylor |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Vinehout, Harris, T. Cullen, C. Larson, Lassa, Hansen, Carpenter, Risser and L. Taylor |
2013-10-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-10-07 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-10-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-10-02 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2013-10-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Labor |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-05-08 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-05-08 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 36 |
2013-05-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-05-08 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-05-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 38 |
2013-05-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 adopted |
2013-05-08 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 38 |
2013-05-08 | House | Read a second time |
2013-05-08 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goyke |
2013-05-07 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:02 PM on 5-8-2013 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 9 |
2013-05-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representatives Goyke, Hebl and Wachs |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on calendar 5-8-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-04-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2013-04-15 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 4 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2013-04-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-04-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Kuglitsch |
2013-04-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Goyke, Wachs and Hebl |
2013-04-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Goyke, Wachs and Hebl |
2013-03-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-03-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kuglitsch |
2013-03-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-18 | House | Introduced |