WI AB258 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.455 (2) (cp) and 165.989 of the statutes; Relating to: community-oriented policing-house grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Community-oriented policing-house grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. David Armstrong [R] | Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R] | Rep. Sylvia Ortiz-Velez [D] |
Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-11 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2021-06-09 | House | Placed on calendar 6-16-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-09 | House | Representative Dittrich added as a coauthor |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-08 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2021-06-08 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2021-06-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-05-19 | House | Representative Macco added as a coauthor |
2021-05-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-05-13 | House | Representative Duchow added as a coauthor |
2021-05-13 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Steineke and Stubbs |
2021-04-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced |