WI AB253 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 281.36 (3r) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: public access to wetlands benefitting from the in lieu fee subprogram.
Title
Public access to wetlands benefitting from the in lieu fee subprogram.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Elijah Behnke [R] | Rep. Scott Johnson [R] | Rep. Joel Kitchens [R] |
Rep. Jerry O'Connor [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-01-23 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:12 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 |
2023-10-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-19 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2023-06-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-06-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-05-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment |
2023-05-08 | House | Introduced |