WI AB253 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 968.27 (13), 968.27 (15), 968.35 (1), 968.36 (2) (a), 968.36 (2) (c), 968.36 (5) (b) and 968.37 (2); and to create 968.36 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: pen registers and trap and trace devices.
Title
Pen registers and trap and trace devices.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. David Armstrong [R] | Rep. Samba Baldeh [D] | Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] |
Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:07 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 9, Noes 6 |
2022-02-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-08-19 | House | Representative Baldeh withdrawn as a coauthor |
2021-08-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-04-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced |