WI AB251 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Published 4-16-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Published 4-16-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 946.69 (title); and to create 946.69 (2) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: impersonating a public officer, public employee, or employee of a utility and providing a penalty.
Title
Impersonating a public officer, public employee, or employee of a utility and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-15 | House | Published 4-16-2022 |
2022-04-15 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-15-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 263 |
2022-04-13 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-13-2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Representative Anderson added as a coauthor |
2022-02-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-28-2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-20 | House | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2021-11-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-11-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2021-09-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-08-25 | House | Representatives Penterman, Steffen and Bowen added as coauthors |
2021-08-25 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-05-04 | House | Senator Pfaff added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-13 | House | Senator Ringhand added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-09 | House | Senator Bewley added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-09 | House | Representative Doyle added as a coauthor |
2021-04-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced |