WI AB247 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 70.511 (2) (a), 74.35 (5) (c) and 74.37 (4) (b); and to create 101.643 and 893.38 of the statutes; Relating to: extension of certain approvals and occupancy permits under the uniform dwelling code, extension of certain approvals that are subject to administrative, judicial, or appellate proceedings, waiver of interest and penalties on late 2021 property tax payments, and waiver of the timely payment requirement for filing certain property tax claims. (FE)
Title
Extension of certain approvals and occupancy permits under the uniform dwelling code, extension of certain approvals that are subject to administrative, judicial, or appellate proceedings, waiver of interest and penalties on late 2021 property tax payments, and waiver of the timely payment requirement for filing certain property tax claims. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-09-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-23 | House | Placed on calendar 9-28-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-09-22 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2021-09-22 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2021-09-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-08-25 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-08-24 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Vorpagel |
2021-06-23 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2021-05-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced |