WI AB231 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 125.12 (5); to amend 125.32 (3) (c) and 125.68 (4) (c) 4.; and to create 125.07 (3) (a) 17., 125.12 (5) (b), 125.26 (2v), 125.27 (5), 125.32 (3m) (k), 125.51 (3) (bv) and 125.51 (5) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: the issuance by the Department of Revenue of retail alcohol beverage permits for motor vehicle racetrack grounds and authorizing caterers to make retail sales of alcohol beverages on racetrack grounds. (FE)
Title
The issuance by the Department of Revenue of retail alcohol beverage permits for motor vehicle racetrack grounds and authorizing caterers to make retail sales of alcohol beverages on racetrack grounds. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-05-11 | House | Representative Schraa added as a coauthor |
2021-05-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-05-06 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 11, Noes 1 |
2021-05-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-04-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-04-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2021-04-02 | House | Introduced |