WI AB229 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 94.64 (1) (a); to amend 94.64 (3m) (a) (intro.), 94.64 (3m) (a) 1., 94.64 (9) (c), 94.65 (4) (a) (intro.) and 94.65 (4) (b); and to create 94.64 (1) (ag), 94.64 (1) (u), 94.64 (2) (f), 94.64 (3m) (a) 3., 94.65 (1) (bm), 94.65 (1) (fm) and 94.65 (5m) of the statutes; Relating to: the distribution and labeling of fertilizers and soil or plant additives produced from manure. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The distribution and labeling of fertilizers and soil or plant additives produced from manure. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-15HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2022-03-10HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2022-03-10HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 13, Noes 0
2022-03-10HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 13, Noes 0
2022-02-08HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Committee on Agriculture
2022-02-08HouseExecutive action taken
2022-02-01HousePublic hearing held
2021-04-14HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-03-31HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture
2021-03-31HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback