WI AB211 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 346.65 (2) (bg) of the statutes; Relating to: records of certain offenses related to operating a motor vehicle with a prohibited blood alcohol concentration. (FE)
Title
Records of certain offenses related to operating a motor vehicle with a prohibited blood alcohol concentration. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-08-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-08-22 | House | Representative Sortwell added as a coauthor |
2019-06-06 | House | Representative Fields added as a coauthor |
2019-05-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-28 | House | Representative Zimmerman added as a coauthor |
2019-05-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-05-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab211 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB211.pdf |