WI AB204 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 800.14 (2); to renumber 343.301 (1m) and 814.61 (5); to renumber and amend 800.085 (2), 800.095 (3) and 800.14 (4); to amend 49.90 (12), 49.90 (13) (c), 66.0113 (1) (b) 6., 66.0113 (1) (b) 7. b., 303.18 (2), 755.01 (1), 755.01 (4), 755.17 (1m), 755.17 (2), 799.29 (2), 800.035 (2) (e), 800.035 (5) (a), 800.035 (5) (c), 800.05 (3), 800.06 (1), 800.093 (1) (b), 800.095 (6), 800.095 (7), 800.115 (4), 800.115 (5), 800.13 (1), 800.14 (1), 800.14 (3), 800.14 (5), 806.10 (1) (intro.), 806.14, 814.63 (2), 814.63 (4) and 885.04; and to create 343.301 (1m) (b), 800.005, 800.035 (2) (a) 5., 800.085 (2) (a) to (i), 800.09 (4), 800.095 (3) (c), 800.14 (2m), 800.14 (4) (b) and 814.61 (5) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: municipal ordinance enforcement and court procedures. (FE)
Title
Municipal ordinance enforcement and court procedures. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-12-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-12-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-12-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-09-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Thiesfeldt and Hebl |
2019-07-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-07-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-10 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab204 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB204.pdf |