WI AB194 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 5.06 (2), 971.19 (12) and 971.223 (1); and to create 12.14 of the statutes; Relating to: actions for violations of elections laws.
Title
Actions for violations of elections laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Judiciary and referred to committee on Rules pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2022-02-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Brooks |
2021-11-16 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2021-04-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-04-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Brooks |
2021-04-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks |
2021-03-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-23 | House | Introduced |