WI AB193 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Enrolled on October 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Report correctly enrolled on 10-11-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 59.60 (2) (a); to amend 59.53 (6) (a) 2., 59.54 (27) (a), 59.60 (4) (intro.), 59.60 (4) (a), 59.60 (4) (b), 59.60 (5) (intro.), 59.60 (5) (a), 59.60 (6) (b) 2., 59.60 (6) (b) 3., 59.60 (6) (c), 59.60 (7), 59.60 (8) (a), 59.60 (10), 65.01, 65.02 (5) (intro.), 65.02 (6) (a), 65.02 (6) (b) (intro.), 65.02 (8) (intro.), 65.02 (10), 65.02 (11), 65.03 (1), 65.04 (1), 65.04 (2), 65.04 (4), 65.04 (5), 65.05 (4), 65.05 (5), 65.05 (8), 65.05 (9), 65.06 (1), 65.06 (5) (intro.), 65.06 (14), 65.06 (15), 65.20 (1) (a), 65.20 (1) (b), 65.20 (1) (c), 65.20 (1) (d), 65.20 (1) (e), 65.20 (1) (g), 65.20 (1) (h), 65.90 (1), 65.90 (2), 65.90 (3) (a) (intro.), 65.90 (3) (a) 1., 65.90 (3) (b) (intro.), 65.90 (3) (bm), 65.90 (4), 65.90 (5) (a), 65.90 (5) (b) and 65.90 (6) (intro.); and to create 59.60 (2) (ae), 59.60 (3s), 65.02 (5m), 65.025, 65.90 (1m) and 65.90 (5) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing a biennial budget procedure for political subdivisions. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing a biennial budget procedure for political subdivisions. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-11HouseReport correctly enrolled on 10-11-2019
2019-10-08HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2019-10-08SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-10-08SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2019-10-08SenateRules suspended
2019-10-08SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-10-08SenateRead a second time
2019-10-08SenateSenator Miller added as a cosponsor
2019-10-04SenatePlaced on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-10-04SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2019-06-24SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-06-24SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2019-06-18SenateReceived from Assembly
2019-06-18HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-06-18HouseRead a third time and passed
2019-06-18HouseRules suspended
2019-06-18HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-06-18HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2019-06-18HouseRead a second time
2019-06-13HouseRepresentative Allen added as a coauthor
2019-06-13HousePlaced on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-06-06HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-06-06HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 8, Noes 0
2019-06-06HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 8, Noes 0
2019-05-22HouseExecutive action taken
2019-05-16HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Gundrum
2019-05-07HousePublic hearing held
2019-05-07HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-05-06HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-04-25HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-04-25HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback