WI AB189 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Published 11-22-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Published 11-22-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 36.31 (2m) (b); to amend 36.11 (3) (cm) 5. and 36.65 (3); and to create 36.31 (2m) (b) 2., 36.31 (2m) (b) 3., 36.31 (2m) (b) 4. and 36.31 (2m) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: transferability of courses between the University of Wisconsin System, technical college system, and tribally controlled and private colleges. (FE)
Title
Transferability of courses between the University of Wisconsin System, technical college system, and tribally controlled and private colleges. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Published 11-22-2019 |
2019-11-21 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-21-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 46 |
2019-11-14 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-14-2019 by directive of the Speaker |
2019-11-13 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-13-2019 |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-10-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-10-10 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-10 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-10-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-10-10 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-10 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2019-10-10 | House | Read a second time |
2019-10-08 | House | Placed on calendar 10-10-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-10-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 11, Noes 1 |
2019-10-07 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-02 | House | Representatives Wittke and Allen added as coauthors |
2019-09-27 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Born |
2019-09-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-05-30 | House | Representative Quinn added as a coauthor |
2019-05-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-01 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Born |
2019-04-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2019-04-25 | House | Introduced |