WI AB184 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 100.20 (5) and 100.20 (6); and to create 66.0439, 100.20 (1v) and 100.70 of the statutes; Relating to: regulating the use of certain professional credentials and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Regulating the use of certain professional credentials and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-10-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-24 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Jobs and the Economy, Ayes 10, Noes 2 |
2017-10-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-05-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-04-25 | House | LRB correction |
2017-04-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs and the Economy |
2017-03-28 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab184 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB184.pdf |