WI AB174 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-07 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-07 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 167.31 (2) (d); and to create 29.314 (3) (b) 5., 29.314 (4) (b) 5., 29.314 (5) (b) 5., 167.31 (4) (k) and 941.20 (3) (b) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: nuisance wildlife management at airports.
Title
Nuisance wildlife management at airports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-11-07 | House | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor |
2023-11-06 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-11-02 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-10-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-19 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2023-10-19 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2023-06-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-05-31 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-05-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Murphy |
2023-04-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2023-04-10 | House | Introduced |