WI AB170 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 7.41 (2); and to create 7.41 (4m) and 947.01 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: election observers and providing a penalty.
Title
Election observers and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-04-27 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl |
2021-04-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-04-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl |
2021-03-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2021-03-16 | House | Introduced |