WI AB169 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.405 (6) (b), 36.61 (1) (b), 36.61 (3) (a), 36.61 (5) (b) 1., 36.61 (8) (c) 3., 146.81 (1) (c), 146.89 (1) (r) 1., 146.89 (1) (r) 5., 146.89 (3) (b) 8., 146.89 (3m) (intro.), 146.997 (1) (d) 3., 155.01 (7), 252.14 (1) (ar) 3., 257.01 (5) (a), 257.01 (5) (b), 447.02 (1) (a), 447.02 (1) (b), 447.02 (2) (a), 447.02 (3) (a) (intro.), 447.02 (3) (a) 2., 447.02 (3) (b), 447.02 (5), 447.03 (3) (c), 447.05, 447.06 (1), 447.06 (2) (a) 3., 447.06 (2) (b), 447.06 (2) (c) (intro.), 447.06 (2) (c) 2. (intro.), 447.063, 447.065, 447.07 (1), 447.07 (3) (intro.), 447.07 (3) (e) to (h), 447.40 (intro.), 447.40 (6), 448.03 (2) (a), 448.21 (1) (a), 450.03 (1) (e), 450.10 (3) (a) 4., 462.02 (2) (d), 462.04, 463.10 (5), 463.12 (5), 632.87 (4), 895.48 (1m) (a) (intro.), 895.48 (1m) (a) 2. and 941.315 (5); and to create 36.61 (1) (ak), 440.03 (13) (b) 20m., 440.08 (2) (a) 25m., 447.01 (6g), 447.01 (6r), 447.02 (1) (g), 447.02 (3) (a) 3., 447.02 (6), 447.03 (1m), 447.03 (3) (am), 447.04 (1m), 447.057, 447.06 (1m) and 447.06 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: licensure of dental therapists; extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from rule-making procedures; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Licensure of dental therapists; extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from rule-making procedures; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-03-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-18 | House | Representative Tusler added as a coauthor |
2021-03-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Assembly Organization |
2021-03-16 | House | Introduced |