WI AB169 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 895.481 (1) (b) 5d. and 895.481 (1) (b) 5r. of the statutes; Relating to: immunity from civil liability for certain equine activities.
Title
Immunity from civil liability for certain equine activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-11-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-11-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2015-10-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-10-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-04-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab169 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB169.pdf |