WI AB167 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: requiring the Department of Financial Institutions to study and report on establishing a section 529A ABLE savings account program. (FE)
Title
Requiring the Department of Financial Institutions to study and report on establishing a section 529A ABLE savings account program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-20 | House | Representative Hesselbein added as a coauthor |
2022-01-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-19 | House | Representatives Vining, Shelton and Spreitzer added as coauthors |
2022-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor |
2021-11-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-11-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2021-10-21 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-10-14 | House | Representatives Subeck and Armstrong added as coauthors |
2021-10-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-05-26 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2021-04-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2021-03-16 | House | Introduced |