WI AB155 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 100.20 (2) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: the sale or rental of soda water beverage equipment and coin-operated vending machines. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The sale or rental of soda water beverage equipment and coin-operated vending machines. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2024-02-26SenateAvailable for scheduling
2024-02-26SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2024-02-22SenateReceived from Assembly
2024-02-22HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2024-02-22HouseRead a third time and passed
2024-02-22HouseRules suspended
2024-02-22HouseOrdered to a third reading
2024-02-22HouseRead a second time
2024-02-20HouseMade a special order of business at 10:07 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
2024-02-14HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2024-02-14HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 8, Noes 0
2024-01-24HouseRepresentative Brandtjen added as a coauthor
2023-09-13HouseRepresentative Macco added as a coauthor
2023-09-01HouseRepresentative Melotik added as a coauthor
2023-08-24HouseRepresentative Penterman withdrawn as a coauthor
2023-05-31HouseExecutive action taken
2023-05-24HouseRepresentative Rettinger added as a coauthor
2023-05-18HousePublic hearing held
2023-05-04HouseRepresentative Madison added as a coauthor
2023-05-01HouseFiscal estimate received
2023-04-10HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection
2023-04-10HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback