WI AB153 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-01 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-01 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 9.01 (1) (a) 1., 9.01 (1) (ag) 2., 9.01 (1) (ag) 4., 9.01 (1) (ar) 3. and 20.510 (1) (g); and to create 9.01 (1) (a) 2. c. and 9.01 (1) (a) 5. of the statutes; Relating to: aggrieved parties petitioning for a recount and making an appropriation.
Title
Aggrieved parties petitioning for a recount and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-01 | House | Published 12-1-2017 |
2017-12-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-30-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 120 |
2017-11-28 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-28-2017 |
2017-11-22 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-22-2017 |
2017-11-09 | House | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-09 | House | Senate Amendment 1 concurred in |
2017-11-07 | House | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate amendment 1 adopted) |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 20, Noes 13 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Fitzgerald |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-06-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a second time |
2017-06-14 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:01 PM on 6-21-2017 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 11 |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-05-19 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2017-05-19 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2017-05-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tusler |
2017-04-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-04-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2017-03-20 | House | Introduced |