WI AB143 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Published 5-22-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Published 5-22-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 48.21 (6), 48.217 (2), 48.217 (2m) (c), 48.357 (2) (a), 48.357 (2m) (a), 48.437 (2), 938.217 (2), 938.357 (2) (a) and 938.357 (2m) (a); to amend 48.217 (1) (b) 2., 48.357 (1) (am) 1. c., 48.38 (5) (c) 1., 48.38 (5) (d), 48.38 (5m) (d), 48.437 (1) (a) 2., 48.437 (1) (c), 48.73, 938.217 (1) (b) 2., 938.357 (1) (am) 1., 938.38 (5) (c) 1., 938.38 (5) (d) and 938.38 (5m) (d); and to create 48.02 (14k), 48.02 (17t), 48.21 (1) (c), 48.21 (5) (b) 2g., 48.21 (5) (cm), 48.21 (6) (b), 48.217 (1) (b) 3., 48.217 (1) (b) 4., 48.217 (2) (b) and (c), 48.217 (2m) (b) 3., 48.217 (2m) (c) 2. and 3., 48.217 (2v) (d) 1. and 2., 48.32 (1) (b) 1r., 48.32 (1) (cd), 48.33 (4) (cm), 48.33 (4) (cr), 48.355 (2) (b) 6d., 48.355 (2) (cd), 48.357 (1) (am) 1m. and 1r., 48.357 (1) (c) 1r., 48.357 (2) (a) 2., 3. and 4., 48.357 (2) (b) 5. and 6., 48.357 (2m) (a) 2., 48.357 (2v) (a) 5. and 6., 48.38 (1) (ag), 48.38 (1) (ap), 48.38 (1) (c), 48.38 (3m), 48.38 (4) (k), 48.38 (4) (L), 48.38 (5) (bm) 4., 48.38 (5m) (c) 4., 48.437 (1) (a) 3. and 4., 48.437 (2) (b) and (c), 48.437 (2v) (d), 48.48 (20), 48.675, 48.715 (8), 938.02 (14m), 938.02 (17t), 938.21 (1) (c), 938.21 (5) (b) 2g., 938.21 (5) (cm), 938.217 (1) (b) 3. and 4., 938.217 (2) (b) and (c), 938.217 (2m) (b) 3., 938.217 (2v) (d) 1. and 2., 938.32 (1) (c) 1r., 938.32 (1) (cd), 938.33 (4) (cm), 938.33 (4) (cr), 938.355 (2) (b) 6d., 938.355 (2) (cd), 938.357 (1) (am) 1m. and 1r., 938.357 (1) (c) 1r., 938.357 (2) (a) 2., 3. and 4., 938.357 (2) (b) 5. and 6., 938.357 (2m) (a) 2., 938.357 (2v) (a) 5. and 6., 938.38 (1) (ag), 938.38 (1) (as), 938.38 (1) (bp), 938.38 (3m), 938.38 (4) (k), 938.38 (4) (L), 938.38 (5) (cm) and 938.38 (5m) (c) 4. of the statutes; Relating to: qualified residential treatment programs and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Qualified residential treatment programs and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | House | Published 5-22-2021 |
2021-05-21 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 5-21-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 42 |
2021-05-20 | House | Presented to the Governor on 5-20-2021 |
2021-05-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 5-18-2021 |
2021-05-18 | House | LRB correction |
2021-05-11 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-05-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-05-11 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-05-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Read a second time |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-05-06 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-03-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-03-24 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2021-03-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced |