WI AB143 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-11)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Published 5-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-11)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Published 5-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 194.01 (1) and 194.01 (2); and to create 340.01 (23g) (b) 4., 440.08 (2) (a) 69m. and subchapter IV of chapter 440 [precedes 440.40] of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of transportation network companies, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Regulation of transportation network companies, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 12 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 11 laid on table (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 10 laid on table (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 9 laid on table (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 8 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 7 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 6 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 12 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 11 laid on table (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 10 laid on table (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 9 laid on table (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 8 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 7 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 6 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Published 5-2-2015 |
2015-05-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 5-1-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 16 |
2015-04-29 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-29-2015 |
2015-04-22 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-22-2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended and taken up |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senators Risser, Vinehout, Miller, L. Taylor and Bewley |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Risser, Vinehout, Miller, Bewley and L. Taylor |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Risser, Vinehout, Miller, L. Taylor, Carpenter and Bewley |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-21-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 79, Noes 19 |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Representatives Kooyenga and Heaton added as coauthors |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 12 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 35 |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 12 offered by Representatives Zepnick, C. Taylor, Zamarripa, Goyke, Brostoff, Subeck and Berceau |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 11 laid on table, Ayes 67, Noes 32 |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 11 offered by Representatives Kahl, Wachs, Bowen, Zepnick, Genrich, Goyke and Ohnstad |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 10 laid on table, Ayes 64, Noes 35 |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 10 offered by Representatives Kahl, Wachs, Bowen, Zepnick, Genrich, Goyke and Ohnstad |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 9 laid on table, Ayes 67, Noes 32 |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 9 offered by Representatives Subeck, Sargent, Zepnick, Kahl, Wachs, Spreitzer, Hebl, C. Taylor, Goyke and Bowen |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 8 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 36 |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 8 offered by Representatives Brostoff, Johnson, Wachs, Spreitzer, Zepnick and Ohnstad |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 69, Noes 30 |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Subeck, Sargent, Zepnick, Kahl, Wachs, Spreitzer, Hebl, C. Taylor and Hintz |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 66, Noes 33 |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Shankland, Barca, Hebl, Wachs and Spreitzer |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 7 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 36 |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 7 offered by Representative Zamarripa |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 36 |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 offered by Representatives Zamarripa, Barca, Shankland and Mason |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 adopted |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representatives August and Mason |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a second time |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on calendar 4-14-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-04-08 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 11, Noes 2 |
2015-04-08 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2015-04-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-04-08 | House | Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2015-04-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representatives Zamarripa, Brostoff and Sinicki |
2015-04-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Zamarripa, Brostoff and Sinicki |
2015-04-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Brostoff, Ohnstad, Sinicki and Zamarripa |
2015-04-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives August and Mason |
2015-04-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-04-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-04-02 | House | Representative Goyke added as a coauthor |
2015-04-01 | House | Senator Harris Dodd added as a cosponsor |
2015-03-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced |