WI AB141 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-3)
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Published 11-22-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-3)
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Published 11-22-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 74.11 (4), 74.11 (7), 74.11 (8), 74.11 (10) (a), 74.12 (6), 74.12 (7) and 74.12 (8); to amend 74.12 (9) (a) and 74.69 (1); and to create 74.11 (4) (b), 74.11 (7) (b), 74.11 (8) (b), 74.11 (10) (a) 2., 74.12 (6) (b), 74.12 (7) (b), 74.12 (8) (b) and 74.12 (9) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: due dates for paying property taxes. (FE)
Title
Due dates for paying property taxes. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Published 11-22-2019 |
2019-11-21 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-21-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 40 |
2019-11-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-15-2019 by directive of the Speaker |
2019-10-11 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 10-11-2019 |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2019-05-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-05-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-04-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduced |