WI AB141 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 813.12 (3) (aj) and 813.12 (4) (aj); and to create 813.12 (1) (ce), 813.122 (1) (e), 813.122 (4) (bg), 813.122 (5) (bg), 813.123 (1) (ek), 813.123 (4) (av), 813.123 (5) (av), 813.125 (3) (ag) and 813.125 (4) (aL) of the statutes; Relating to: including orders pertaining to household pets in certain restraining orders and injunctions.
Title
Including orders pertaining to household pets in certain restraining orders and injunctions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-09-10 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-09-10 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2015-09-10 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2015-09-10 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2015-08-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-05-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Jacque |
2015-05-14 | House | Representative Brostoff added as a coauthor |
2015-05-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-04-07 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Jacque |
2015-03-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab141 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB141.pdf |