WI AB140 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.115 (7) (vb) and 93.56 of the statutes; Relating to: expanding the clean sweep program to include collection of certain fire fighting foams and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Expanding the clean sweep program to include collection of certain fire fighting foams and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-11-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-11-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2021-11-15 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2021-05-19 | House | Representative Plumer added as a coauthor |
2021-05-12 | House | Representatives Shankland and Behnke added as coauthors |
2021-05-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-04-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-04-07 | House | Representative James added as a coauthor |
2021-04-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ramthun |
2021-03-15 | House | Representative Billings added as a coauthor |
2021-03-11 | House | Representative Pfaff added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced |