WI AB131 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 299.46 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting the sale and use of coal tar-based sealants and high PAH sealant products. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting the sale and use of coal tar-based sealants and high PAH sealant products. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-04-26 | House | Senator Smith added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-25 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-03-25 | House | Representative Sortwell withdrawn as a coauthor |
2021-03-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced |