WI AB128 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 50.373 of the statutes; Relating to: requiring informed consent before performing a pelvic exam on a patient who is under general anesthesia or unconscious.
Title
Requiring informed consent before performing a pelvic exam on a patient who is under general anesthesia or unconscious.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-15 | House | Representative Vining added as a coauthor |
2022-03-01 | House | Representatives Sinicki and Hesselbein added as coauthors |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2022-02-01 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2021-10-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-10-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Cabral-Guevara |
2021-08-18 | House | Representative Mursau added as a coauthor |
2021-07-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-07-29 | House | Representatives Plumer and Dittrich added as coauthors |
2021-03-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced |