WI AB121 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 16.307 (2), 16.307 (2m) and 20.505 (7) (h); and to create 16.307 (1m) and 20.505 (7) (fn) of the statutes; Relating to: housing navigator grants and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Housing navigator grants and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Utilities and Housing |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-11 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-06-11 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2019-06-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-05-31 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dittrich |
2019-05-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-26 | House | Representative Novak added as a coauthor |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab121 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB121.pdf |