WI AB118 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 157.70 (2) (b) and 157.70 (2) (f); to consolidate, renumber and amend 157.70 (5) (b) (intro.) and 1.; to amend 15.705 (1) (b), 44.02 (23), 70.11 (13), 157.70 (1) (c), 157.70 (2) (a), 157.70 (2) (e), 157.70 (2m) (b), 157.70 (2m) (c), 157.70 (2m) (d), 157.70 (3) (b), 157.70 (4) (a), 157.70 (4) (d), 157.70 (5) (b) 2., 157.70 (5) (c) 1., 157.70 (5) (c) 2. (intro.), 157.70 (5) (c) 2m., 157.70 (5) (c) 3., 157.70 (5) (c) 5., 157.70 (6) (a) (intro.) and 157.70 (6) (c); and to create 157.70 (1) (em), 157.70 (1) (gm), 157.70 (2) (j), 157.70 (2c), 157.70 (2g), 157.70 (2j), 157.70 (2m) (g) and (h), 157.70 (4) (cm), 157.70 (5) (c) 2o., 157.70 (6) (bm), 157.70 (9m) and 709.03 (form) C. 21m. of the statutes; Relating to: disclosure of burial sites located on residential real estate and various changes relating to the preservation and disturbance of burial sites. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disclosure of burial sites located on residential real estate and various changes relating to the preservation and disturbance of burial sites. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04HousePublished 4-4-2018
2018-04-04HouseReport approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 222
2018-04-02HousePresented to the Governor on 4-2-2018
2018-03-29HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-03-26HouseReport correctly enrolled on 3-26-2018
2018-03-21HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2018-03-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-03-20SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2018-03-20SenateRules suspended
2018-03-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-03-20SenateRead a second time
2018-03-15SenatePlaced on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-01-18SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-01-18SenateReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-01-17SenateExecutive action taken
2018-01-04SenatePublic hearing held
2017-11-20SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2017-11-09SenateReceived from Assembly
2017-11-09HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-11-09HouseRead a third time and passed
2017-11-09HouseRules suspended
2017-11-09HouseOrdered to a third reading
2017-11-09HouseRead a second time
2017-11-07HousePlaced on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules
2017-11-06HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2017-11-06HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Environment and Forestry, Ayes 8, Noes 0
2017-10-19HouseExecutive action taken
2017-10-03HousePublic hearing held
2017-04-24HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-03-30HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-03-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-03-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-03-08HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-03-02HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Environment and Forestry
2017-03-02HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback