WI AB116 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 102.03 (2), 102.81 (5), 102.82 (1) and 814.04 (intro.); and to create 102.80 (1) (dm), 102.81 (4g) and 103.08 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting abusive work environments and allowing an individual who has been subjected to such an environment to bring a civil action. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting abusive work environments and allowing an individual who has been subjected to such an environment to bring a civil action. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-08-29 | House | Representative Considine added as a coauthor |
2019-06-06 | House | Representative Fields added as a coauthor |
2019-05-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-22 | House | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2019-04-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Integrated Employment |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab116 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB116.pdf |