WI AB115 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 16.317, 46.40 (2m) (c), 49.823, 103.005 (22) and 165.257 of the statutes; Relating to: the authority of the departments of administration, children and families, workforce development, justice, and health services to allocate federal grant money for civil legal aid.
Title
The authority of the departments of administration, children and families, workforce development, justice, and health services to allocate federal grant money for civil legal aid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-05-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-02 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-02 | House | Read a second time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on calendar 5-2-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-04-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 10, Noes 1 |
2017-04-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-03-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-03-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab115 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB115.pdf |