WI AB1045 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.935 of the statutes; Relating to: online dashboards reporting on the performance of certain state agencies with respect to core agency functions. (FE)
Title
Online dashboards reporting on the performance of certain state agencies with respect to core agency functions. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-03-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-03-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-03-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-18 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced |