WI AB1011 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 121.91 (4) (s) of the statutes; Relating to: adjusting a school district's revenue limit for certain school safety expenditures. (FE)
Title
Adjusting a school district's revenue limit for certain school safety expenditures. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-03-13 | House | Representative Genrich added as a coauthor |
2018-03-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2018-03-09 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab1011 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB1011.pdf |