WI AB101 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 767.225 (1) (e); and to amend 565.30 (5m) (a), 767.34 (1), 767.35 (1) (c), 767.511 (6m), 767.531 (intro.), 767.54, 767.553 (1) (a), 767.59 (1), 767.61 (3) (i), 767.71 (1) (a), 767.73 (1) (a), 767.75 (1) (b), 767.77 (1) and 767.78 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: elimination of family support.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elimination of family support.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-06-06HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 0
2019-05-23HouseExecutive action taken
2019-04-11HousePublic hearing held
2019-03-22HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-03-22HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback