WI AB1005 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 103.155 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting employers from testing employees and prospective employees for the presence of tetrahydrocannabinols, synthetic cannabinoids, or controlled substance analogs of tetrahydrocannabinols or synthetic cannabinoids as a condition of employment. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting employers from testing employees and prospective employees for the presence of tetrahydrocannabinols, synthetic cannabinoids, or controlled substance analogs of tetrahydrocannabinols or synthetic cannabinoids as a condition of employment. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. David Bowen [D] | Sen. Melissa Agard [D] | Sen. Mark Spreitzer [D] | Rep. Christine Sinicki [D] |
Rep. Jimmy Anderson [D] | Rep. Jonathan Brostoff [D] | Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] | Rep. Leon Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-15 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2018-03-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor |
2018-03-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab1005 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB1005.pdf |