WI AB10 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.320 (1) (sm), 281.59 (1) (as), 281.59 (9) (a) and 281.60; to amend 13.48 (26), 20.370 (4) (mt), 20.370 (9) (mt), 20.505 (1) (v), 20.536 (1) (ka), 25.43 (1) (h), 25.43 (2s) (a) 2., 25.43 (3), 67.12 (12) (a), 281.59 (2) (a), 281.59 (2) (b), 281.59 (3) (a) 1., 281.59 (3) (a) 5., 281.59 (3) (j), 281.59 (9) (am), 281.59 (9) (b) (intro.), 281.59 (9) (b) 1., 281.59 (11) (a), 281.59 (11) (b), 281.59 (11) (c), 281.59 (13s) and 281.59 (14); and to create 281.605 of the statutes; Relating to: eliminating the land recycling loan program. (FE)
Title
Eliminating the land recycling loan program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-03-13 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2024-03-13 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2023-03-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-03-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-02-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Penterman |
2023-02-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced |