WI AB10 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 49.854 (2) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: certification of child support debt for the child support lien docket and partially suspending an administrative rule promulgated by the Department of Children and Families.
Title
Certification of child support debt for the child support lien docket and partially suspending an administrative rule promulgated by the Department of Children and Families.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to committee on State Affairs |
2021-03-11 | House | Placed on calendar 3-16-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-03-04 | House | Report without recommendation pursuant to s. 227.26(2)(h), Wisconsin Statutes, by Committee on State Affairs |
2021-03-04 | House | Joint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules report received pursuant to s.227.26(2)(g), Wisconsin Statutes |
2021-01-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced |