WI AB10 | 2011 | January Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on September 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on September 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 59.692 (6m), 62.231 (6m), 87.30 (1) (d) and 281.165 (1); and to create 281.165 (4) of the statutes; relating to: an exemption from water quality standards for wetlands and from certain other regulatory provisions concerning water quality and surface water use that apply to a wetland area in Brown County; and review of certain changes to shoreland, wetland, and floodplain zoning ordinances that apply to a wetland area in Brown County. (FE)
Title
An exemption from water quality standards for wetlands and from certain other regulatory provisions concerning water quality and surface water use that apply to a wetland area in Brown County; and review of certain changes to shoreland, wetland, and floodplain zoning ordinances that apply to a wetland area in Brown County. (FE)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2011-02-09 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2011-02-02 | Laid on the table | |
2011-01-31 | Placed on calendar 2-2-2011 by committee on Rules | |
2011-01-28 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2011-01-28 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 9, Noes 6 | |
2011-01-28 | Report Assembly Amendment 4 adoption recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | |
2011-01-27 | Executive action taken | |
2011-01-27 | Assembly amendment 4 offered by Representatives Mursau, Rivard, Williams, Kleefisch, Nerison, J. Ott, Severson, Steineke and Tiffany | |
2011-01-27 | Assembly amendment 3 offered by Representative Molepske Jr | |
2011-01-27 | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representative Molepske Jr | |
2011-01-26 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Hulsey | |
2011-01-26 | Public hearing held | |
2011-01-24 | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/jr1/asm/bill/ab10 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/JR1/AB10.pdf |