WI AB1 | 2018 | March Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.455 (2) (f) and 165.88 of the statutes; Relating to: grants to schools for school safety and safety-related upgrades to school buildings, equipment, and facilities; providing an exemption from rule-making procedures; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants to schools for school safety and safety-related upgrades to school buildings, equipment, and facilities; providing an exemption from rule-making procedures; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-03-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-03-20 | House | LRB correction |
2018-03-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2018-03-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/mr8/asm/bill/ab1 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/MR8/AB1.pdf |