WA SJR8213 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Constitution to allow at least fifty-five percent of voters voting to authorize school district bonds.
Title
Amending the Constitution to allow at least fifty-five percent of voters voting to authorize school district bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=8213&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Joint Resolutions/8213.pdf |