WA SJR8212 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adding members to and revising procedures for investigation of complaints by the judicial conduct commission.
Title
Adding members to and revising procedures for investigation of complaints by the judicial conduct commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-28 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-01-11 | Revert to Rules White Sheet. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-24 | JUD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-20 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-06 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |