WA SJR8203 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the state Constitution to allow a reasonable suspicion standard in certain searches of students on school grounds.
Title
Amending the state Constitution to allow a reasonable suspicion standard in certain searches of students on school grounds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice . |
Same As/Similar To
HJR4209 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=8203&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Joint Resolutions/8203.pdf |