WA SJM8026 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting the Interstate Commission for Adult Offender Supervision immediately initiate its emergency rule-making process.
Title
Requesting the Interstate Commission for Adult Offender Supervision immediately initiate its emergency rule-making process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-02 | President signed. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-28 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | HS - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-13 | First reading, referred to Human Services. | |
2010-02-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | HSC - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-03 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:00 PM. | |
2010-02-02 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-28 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |