WA SJM8018 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a federal nuclear waste repository.
Title
Concerning a federal nuclear waste repository.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Sen. Shelly Short [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |