WA SJM8017 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting Congress to reform the harbor maintenance tax.
Title
Requesting Congress to reform the harbor maintenance tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | TRED - Majority; do pass. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development. |