WA SJM8017 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting that the restoration of sustainable, healthy forests be a national priority.
Title
Requesting that the restoration of sustainable, healthy forests be a national priority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-26 | NROR - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources, Ocean & Recreation. | |
2010-01-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=8017&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Joint Memorials/8017-Forest restoration.pdf |