WA SJM8016 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the federal harbor maintenance tax.
Title
Concerning the federal harbor maintenance tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | FIET - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |